SOUTH CHARNWOOD HIGH SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational activities to provide financial support over and above that provided through local anuthority budget
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 03 March 1995: Standard registration
- 22 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.79k | £16.81k | £14.97k | £15.58k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.40k | £23.23k | £18.49k | £16.43k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 22 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 24 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 04 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 21 April 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SET OF RULES ADOPTED 15 FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SOUTH CHARNWOOD HIGH SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window