Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF STEWART FLEMING SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 April 2025 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 March 2025 636 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 November 2024 861 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 November 2024 1226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required