THE FRIENDS OF WALTHAM ABBEY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and enhance the fabric of Waltham Abbey Church, as a building of historical and architectural importance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 02 March 1995: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF WALTHAM ABBEY (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA MACNEILL | Chair | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Hudson | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Theokli | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Caroline Moores | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Roy Anderson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Olivia Davis | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anderson | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Myra Purton | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GILLETT | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY MAIDMENT | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
LIN MURRELL | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jenkyn Walters | Trustee | 19 May 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.25k | £2.78k | £396.39k | £13.46k | £15.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.76k | £5.88k | £6.04k | £12.18k | £10.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED 7 MAY 2003 AND 26 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE THE FABRIC OF WALTHAM ABBEY CHURCH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE PARISH CHURCH OF WALTHAM ABBEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARISH OFFICE
Abbey Church Centre
Abbey Gardens
WALTHAM ABBEY
EN9 1XQ
- Phone:
- 01992767873
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window