THE WALTER PARKER MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND FOR NELSON AND COLNE COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
tO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING ONCE IN EACH YEAR A MONEY GRANT TO OR FOR THE STUDENT AGED UNDER 25 YEARS WHO HAS ATTENDED DURING THAT YEAR A COURSE AT THE COLLEGE IN AN INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SUBJECT AND WHO IS IN THE OPINION OF THE PRIZE TRUSTEES MOST WORTHY OF THE ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF HIS OR HER WORK OR MERIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Helen Dand | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID LESLEY ROTHWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54 | £3 | £1 | £13 | £49 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING ONCE IN EACH YEAR A MONEY GRANT TO OR FOR THE STUDENT AGED TWENTY FIVE YEARS WHO HAS ATTENEDED DURING THAT YEAR A COURSE AT THE COLLEGE IN AN INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL SUBJECT AND WHO IS, IN THE OPINION OF THE PRIZE TRUSTEES MOST WORTHY OF ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF HIS OR HER WORK OR MERIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NELSON & COLNE COLLEGE
SCOTLAND ROAD
NELSON
BB9 7YT
- Phone:
- 01282440200
- Email:
- dand@nelson.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window