BARBARA BARLOW CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees consider the numerous requests for grants and decide on the most suitable ones to promote, protect and preserve for the benefit of the community the natural, physical, historical and architectural and such other features of the East Anglian region as are of special interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 March 1995: Standard registration
- 09 October 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84k | £1.20k | £1.24k | £1.15k | £3.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.85k | £1.81k | £3.71k | £1.48k | £180 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 04 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 30 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE NATURAL PHYSICAL OF THE COMMUNITY THE NATURAL PHYSICAL AND HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL AND SUCH OTHER FEATURES OF THE EAST ANGLIAN REGION AS ARE OF SPECIAL INTREST (2) TO FURTHER PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS IN CONNECTION WITH THE FIRST OBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH (3) TO BENEFIT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window