THE HISTORIC GARDENS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An educational charity promoting the study of historic parks and gardens throughout the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN MARGARET MAWREY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Llewelyn Phillips | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|||||
RICHARD BROOKE MAWREY QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM ANTHONY ZIEGLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELEANOR MAWREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.37k | £10.98k | £16.10k | £8.51k | £206 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.86k | £11.39k | £16.45k | £10.44k | £2.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER EDUCATION BY PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF HISTORIC GARDENS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 33-34
River Court
Upper Ground
London
SE1 9PE
- Phone:
- 02076339165
- Email:
- office@historicgardens.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window