ESSEX ROAD PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Essex Rd Pre-School is a vibrant, busy nursery set in the middle of a council estate. We are open term time only and registered for 24 children. We offer sessional and all day care from 9 o'clock - 3 o'clock - Monday - Friday. We are monitored annually with Islington Council and our last Ofsted was good.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 06 March 1995: Standard registration
- 10 February 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 February 2012: Funds transferred to 1136131 ESSEX ROAD PRE-SCHOOL
- ESSEX ROAD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.67k | £71.39k | £71.90k | £79.75k | £87.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.59k | £65.69k | £68.11k | £79.31k | £84.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 05 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 26 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 26 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 15 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 15 October 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE ISLINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window