WESTDALE INFANTS' SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money through events with parents. Receiving donations. Money received provides opportunities for the school to purchase resources, engage performers and improve the educational experience of the children in school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 March 1995: Standard registration
- WESTDALE FUNDRAISERS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Gay | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEE FREELEY | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Estell | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lewis | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.96k | £10.51k | £7.65k | £13.90k | £7.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.23k | £10.21k | £7.78k | £18.16k | £8.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF WESTDALE INFANTS' SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTDALE INFANT SCHOOL
WESTDALE LANE
MAPPERLEY
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 6ET
- Phone:
- 01159531606
- Website:
-
westdaleinfants.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window