Financial history 1ST WORTHING SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1044752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.51k £32.74k £14.41k £16.25k £15.81k
Total expenditure £27.64k £15.19k £16.07k £23.42k £22.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k N/A N/A N/A