STEVENAGE SHOPMOBILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Section 2 Objects - To relieve disabled people in Stevenage and the surrounding areas by providing facilities in particular Wheelchairs, Scooters and similar equipment with the object of improving their mobility and conditions of life. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 March 1995: Standard registration
- 08 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.68k | £18.45k | £17.47k | £9.31k | £6.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.86k | £17.11k | £22.64k | £8.51k | £7.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 08 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 09 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND INDEPENDENCE OF DISABLED PERSONS IN STEVENAGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ELECTRIC OR MANUAL WHEELCHAIRS OR ELECTRIC SCOOTERS ON LOAN FOR PERIODS OF NOT MORE THAN A DAY FREE OF CHARGE TO ENABLE THEM TO GO TO SHOPS AND PLACES OF INTEREST IN THE TOWN CENTRE OF STEVENAGE
Area of benefit
STEVENAGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window