Financial history ISLE OF WIGHT CANTATA CHOIR

Charity number: 1044777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.96k £21.09k £16.07k £23.28k £27.72k
Total expenditure £5.13k £13.70k £17.03k £29.16k £29.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A