NORTH STAFFORSHIRE BASICS DOCTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
North Staffs Basics is a voluntary organisation which provides skilled medical care or help at the site of an accident or other medical emergency, or in transit to hospital, in and around North Staffordshire area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 March 1995: Standard registration
- BASICS (Working name)
- NORTH STAFFS BASICS (Working name)
- NORTH STAFFS BASIC FLYING DOCTORS (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARK NASH | Chair | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr MATT ROWLEY | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr LATIF HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELENE WESTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £7.32k | £12.00k | £12.50k | £8.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.89k | £10.13k | £7.69k | £14.02k | £11.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 2008 AND 25 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IMMEDIATE MEDICAL TREATMENT AND CARE TO PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ACCIDENT OR OTHER EMERGENCY IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL REGION OF NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE AND ADJOINING AREAS, AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT TO A MULTI-DISCIPLINARY TEAM PROMOTING PRE-HOSPITAL CARE
Area of benefit
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE AND ADJOINING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sunny Bank House
Sandy Lane
Newcastle
ST5 0LZ
- Phone:
- 07789516015
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window