BUTTERWICK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities are the operation and provision of palliative care facilities and services for patients suffering from life threatening and limiting illness; along with related education into palliative care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,157,937
Donations and legacies | £1.00m | |
Charitable activities | £1.20m | |
Other trading activities | £931.75k | |
Investments | £30 | |
Other | £28.05k |
Total expenditure:
£3,923,334
Raising funds | £1.28m | |
Charitable activities | £2.64m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,195,081 from 4 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.28m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.64m |
People

93 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
113 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Durham
- North Yorkshire
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 07 March 1995: Standard registration
- 24 April 2024: Funds received from 1025953 CHILDREN'S CENTRE SUPPORT GROUP
- BUTTERWICK (Working name)
- BUTTERWICK CHILDRENS HOSPICE (Working name)
- BUTTERWICK HOSPICE (Working name)
- BUTTERWICK HOSPICE AT BISHOP AUCKLAND (Working name)
- BUTTERWICK HOSPICE AT STOCKTON - BUTTERWICK HOSPICE AT BISHOP AUCKLAND (Working name)
- BUTTERWICK HOSPICE CARE (Working name)
- BUTTERWICK HOSPICE STOCKTON ON TEES (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Louise Ward Holder | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Holder | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Tough | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian Patrick Corbett | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Vivienne Evans | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Crewe | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Grant | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Carr | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof Michael Bramble | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25m | £4.40m | £3.28m | £2.82m | £3.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.44m | £3.49m | £3.33m | £2.90m | £3.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £999.57k | £1.20m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £844.01k | £48.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.11m | £1.21m | £1.09m | £944.48k | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.60m | £818.97k | £1.05m | £879.14k | £931.75k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.48m | £1.79m | £1.12m | £999.57k | £1.20m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £37 | £5 | £1 | £5 | £30 | |
|
Income - Other | £57.26k | £577.38k | £18.13k | £0 | £28.05k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £378.31k | £320.77k | £535.12k | £398.21k | £566.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.03m | £2.39m | £2.22m | £1.96m | £2.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.41m | £1.10m | £1.11m | £932.63k | £1.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £137.51k | £118.40k | £96.11k | £99.33k | £98.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.70m | £2.59m | £2.48m | £2.43m | £2.34m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.63k | £4.63k | £4.63k | £4.63k | £4.63k | |
|
Other assets | £486.61k | £1.30m | £1.43m | £1.37m | £1.26m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £560.40k | £347.92k | £411.95k | £383.69k | £939.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 23RD JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES RESIDENTIAL AND DAY CENTRE CARE FOR THE TERMINALLY ILL AND CHRONICALLY SICK AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN CONNECTION WITH THE CARE OF THE TERMINALLY ILL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUTTERWICK HOSPICE
MIDDLEFIELD ROAD
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS19 8XN
- Phone:
- 01642 607742
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window