KIBWORTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KGSH is a community venue serving the villages of Kibworth and Smeeton Westerby. It is also used by outside agencies. We offer a large hall with stage and lighting, and three meeting rooms. Activities are encouraged at the KGSH for all ages - we have a breakfast and after school club and host many U3A groups. We facilitate and support new activities and community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 March 1995: Standard registration
- GRAMMAR SCHOOL HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Lynne Dowling | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|||||
LYNN IRENE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Abbot | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Bland | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN WYBURN | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dawes | Trustee | 26 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.04k | £31.46k | £23.50k | £44.15k | £36.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.62k | £39.69k | £32.33k | £35.08k | £41.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6TH JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2005 AND 1 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
A HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF KIBWORTH HARCOURT AND SMEETON WESTERBY (AND THEIR SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD)
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Grammar School Hall
School Road
Kibworth
LEICESTER
LE8 0EW
- Phone:
- 01162796389
- Email:
- info@kgsh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window