Trustees KIBWORTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL HALL
Charity number: 1044822

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Lynne Dowling | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|||||
LYNN IRENE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Abbot | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Bland | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN WYBURN | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dawes | Trustee | 26 October 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.