PTA AND FRIENDS OF LYMINGTON CATHOLIC SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1044830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Arranging various functions to raise money and provide educational enjoyment for the school: fetes and fairs, easter activities, outings, get togethers. The monies raised are then invested in the school and the children as regards equipment, entertainment, extra learning opportunities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £1,782
Total expenditure: £2,547

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LYMINGTON CATHOLIC SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
  • OUR LADY AND ST JOSEPH CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Troisi Chair 09 January 2023
None on record
Laura McIndoe Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Kerry Ann Di Maria Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Nicole Davies Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Gabriella Wheeler Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Kayleigh Green Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.32k £3.90k £58 £98 £1.78k
Total expenditure £6.66k £471 £216 £604 £2.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Our Lady & St. Joseph
Catholic Primary School
83A Ramley Road
LYMINGTON
Hampshire
SO41 8GY
Phone:
01590672711