Governing document BECCLES CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1044837

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN DECEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED IN SEPTEMBER 1994, APRIL 1997, 7 SEPTEMBER 1999, SEPTEMBER 2001, 26 JUNE 2002, 7 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED 1 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN CHORAL MUSIC PARTICULARLY BY THE STUDY AND PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL WORKS IN THE TOWN AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BECCLES AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.