Accounts and annual returns OSWESTRY SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity number: 1044845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 16 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required