Financial history OSWESTRY SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity number: 1044845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.49k £12.18k £28.77k £35.43k £17.55k
Total expenditure £9.86k £12.19k £36.11k £39.37k £12.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £720