OSWESTRY SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An organisation who gives support to senior citzens and disabled people in the oswestry area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 08 March 1995: Standard registration
- THE OSWESTRY OLD FOLKS CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY MILLS | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Price | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.12k | £5.49k | £12.18k | £28.77k | £35.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.19k | £9.86k | £12.19k | £36.11k | £39.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1989 AS AMENDED 20 FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 2 MARCH 2000 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE AGED AND DISABLED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
OSWESTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oswestry Senior Citizens Club
Lorne Street
OSWESTRY
Shropshire
SY11 1ND
- Phone:
- 01691650147
- Email:
- treasureroscc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window