Accounts and annual returns DISABILITY FIRST

Charity number: 1044848
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 12 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 12 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 08 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 08 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 16 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 16 January 2014 On Time