Financial history LLANSANTFFRAID SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1044849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.21k £2.82k £7.39k £21.54k £18.98k
Total expenditure £11.77k £2.74k £6.39k £15.86k £18.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A