NORTH WEST CHILDREN'S SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims are to provide holidays and social events for disabled and disadvantaged children, and provide support through respite for their parents and carers. The group is totally voluntary run and provides for children : 1. who need the opportunity to share social experiences 2. who would not otherwise have a holiday 3. who's parents need a rest from caring for them through the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 08 March 1995: Standard registration
- 27 November 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NORTH WEST HANDICAPPED CHILDRENS HOLIDAY GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/01/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.32k | £48.25k | £77.90k | £55.77k | £13.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.77k | £41.83k | £43.36k | £50.79k | £95.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 16 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 02 December 2011 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | 16 May 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 29 November 2010 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 29 November 2010 | 29 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 18 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 18 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/01/1993 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 04/02/2010
Charitable objects
1.1.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE,CUMBRIA,GREATER MANCHESTER AND MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window