THE JAMES CAIRD SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to raise public awareness of Shackletons great achievements in the heroic age of Antarctic exploration and his unique qualities of leadership; to sponsor Antarctic research; to support Dulwich College in care of the boat James Caird and the Shackleton archives; to encourage young people to play an active role; to arrange meetings, lectures and exhibitions; to promote charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Lambert | Chair | 04 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Lee Kenny | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brad Borkan | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Andrews | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Winter | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
sebastian coulthard | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Wright | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Roger Ian Slade | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HECTOR MCLEAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE HON ALEXANDRA SHACKLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.05k | £8.43k | £27.99k | £35.07k | £53.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.95k | £3.79k | £35.99k | £24.97k | £59.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPT.1994. AS AMENDED BY C.C. AMENDED 8TH OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BOTH IN UK AND OVERSEAS IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE EXPEDITIONS MADE BY SIR ERNEST SHACKLETON TO ANTARCTICA.
Area of benefit
EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Stott Close
LONDON
SW18 2TG
- Phone:
- 07772812538
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window