Trustees British Society of Special Care Dentistry
Charity number: 1044867

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Bateman | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Willis | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Curl | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Geddis-Regan | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Buckingham | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Walton | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sobia Rafique | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kwasnicki | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.