NORTHILL CE ACADEMY FRIENDS, PARENTS, TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the children at Northill C of E VA Lower School by providing items for use in the classroom and extras like funding coaches for trips and christmas activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 13 March 1995: Standard registration
- NORTHILL (LOWER) SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- NORTHILL C OF E VA LOWER SCHOOL FPTA (Working name)
- NORTHILL LOWER F P T A (Working name)
- NORTHILL V.A. LOWER SCHOOL FRIENDS, PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Warner | Chair | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Morris | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Cameron | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.97k | £3.43k | £5.21k | £1.80k | £2.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.64k | £2.35k | £1.79k | £3.34k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 October 2024 | 490 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH NOVEMBER 1994 as amended on 06 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northill CE Academy
Bedford Road
Northill
BIGGLESWADE
Bedfordshire
SG18 9AH
- Phone:
- 01767 627215
- Email:
- northill.fpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window