MARSTON THOROLD'S CHARITY C E (A) SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR SCHOOL FUND HELPS TO SUBSIDISE SCHOOL TRIPS, SWIMMING, AFTER SCHOOL ACTIVITIES. WE RAISE MONEY BY SUMMER AND CHRISTMAS FAIRS, SPONSORED ACTIVITIES. WE RECEIVE MONEY FROM THE THOROLDS CHARITY WHICH IS USED TO IMPROVE THE PUPILS SCHOOL LIFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Leong | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
GORDON RICHARD CANNON | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR ROSS | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kay Sutherland | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kiala Burton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Waddelle | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Harrison | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steph Kirton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Schaanning | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Jackson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Barker | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stuart Hadley | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.16k | £16.92k | £37.74k | £19.65k | £20.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.83k | £14.48k | £32.01k | £24.24k | £27.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MARSTON THOROLD'S C E (A) SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARSTON THOROLDS CHARITY
C OF E SCHOOL
SCHOOL LANE
MARSTON
GRANTHAM
NG32 2HQ
- Phone:
- 01400250583
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window