CASTLE HOWARD ARBORETUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and extend plant collections, make them available to the public, ensure scientific integrity of records and develop educational and information services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£535,913
Donations and legacies | £329.78k | |
Charitable activities | £194.31k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.83k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£515,463
Raising funds | £6.10k | |
Charitable activities | £509.36k | |
Other | £0 |
-£3,816 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £509.36k | |
Retained for future use | £20.45k |
People

13 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 March 1995: Standard registration
- C H A T (Working name)
- CHAT (Working name)
- WILD ABOUT WOOD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREVILLE THOMAS WORTHINGTON | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
William John Wood | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Graham | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Willison | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Bridge | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Helen Crews | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Howard | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL STURGE | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
Professor Nicola Spence | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Hallam Barley | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
THE HONOURABLE NICHOLAS PAUL GEOFFREY HOWARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £480.41k | £675.72k | £426.36k | £280.39k | £535.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £389.93k | £360.62k | £362.74k | £429.22k | £515.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.05k | £260.25k | £22.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £560.57k | N/A | N/A | £329.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £78.93k | N/A | N/A | £194.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £9.08k | N/A | N/A | £11.83k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £27.15k | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £356.59k | N/A | N/A | £509.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £4.03k | N/A | N/A | £6.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.11k | N/A | N/A | £1.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £1.16m | N/A | N/A | £1.33m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £319.63k | N/A | N/A | £196.08k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £258.03k | N/A | N/A | £225.69k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £15.58k | N/A | N/A | £72.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 January 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 15 January 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 January 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 28 January 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5 JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SCIENCE BY THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE CULTIVATION PRESERVATION PROPAGATION AND CONSERVATION OF TREES PLANTS AND PLANT MATERIAL AND FORESTRY AND MATTERS RELATING THERETO (2) THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF TREES PLANTS AND PLANTS MATERIAL AND THE RENDERING OF ADVICE ASSISTANCE AND CONSULTANCY SERVICES IN RELATION THERETO (3) THE ESTABLISHMENT PROVISION MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ANY ARBORETUM GARDENS RESEARCH STATIONS OR FORESTRY ARBORICULTURAL OR HORTICULTURAL CENTRES OR TRIAL GROUNDS AND THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC ACCESS THERETO (4) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND COURSES IN RELATION TO THE CULTIVATION PRESERVATION PROPAGATION AND CONSERVATION OF TREES PLANTS PLANT MATERIAL AND FORESTRY AND MATTERS RELATED THERETO (5) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RECORDS DATABASES AND DATA IN RELATION TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN SUB-CLAUSES (1) TO (4) ABOVE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle Howard Arboretum Trust
Castle Howard
YORK
YO60 7BY
- Phone:
- 01653648598
- Website:
-
yorkshirearboretum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window