THE COASTAL FORCES HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of the public in the history of Coastal Forces by the restoration, preservation and permanent display, for public benefit, of Coastal Forces craft, together with relevant artefacts, records and memorabilia relating to such craft. In furtherance of these activities the Charity supports Coastal Forces veterans and historic craft.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 March 1995: Standard registration
- C F H T (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAdm Rex John Cox | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Stuart Frederic Dreyer | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Patrick John O'Flaherty | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Richard Farrington CBE | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aurora Allen | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fisher BSc | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
COMMANDER ANDREW GORDON-LENNOX Royal Navy | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Captain Christopher Morrison RN | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|||||
ALAN WATSON | Trustee | 24 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY HICHENS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.45k | £25.07k | £74.59k | £305.48k | £28.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.48k | £239.14k | £286.31k | £111.30k | £34.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF COASTAL FORCES BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND PERMANENT DISPLAY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF COASTAL FORCES CRAFT TOGETHER WITH RELEVANT ARTEFACTS, RECORDS AND MEMORABILIA RELATING TO SUCH CRAFT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coastal Forces Heritage Trust
NMRN
HM Naval Base (PP66)
PORTSMOUTH
Hampshire
PO1 3NH
- Phone:
- 02392727129
- Email:
- accountscfht@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window