Cri du Chat Support Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Produces a monthly e- newsletter and provides the opportunity for families and professionals to meet at events, both nationally and regionally. Provides support through a network of families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 March 1995: Standard registration
- CRI DU CHAT SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- THE CRI DU CHAT SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Roberts | Chair | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAMIAN JOEL HAYWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.84k | £14.04k | £23.11k | £23.11k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.31k | £8.60k | £11.46k | £11.46k | £23.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED 5 NOVEMBER 1994 as amended on 28 Sep 2019 as amended on 28 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE ANY PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CRI DU CHAT SYNDROME IN ANY MANNER THAT MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE THOUGHT FIT (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, MEDICAL PROFESSION, PARENTS AND CARERS ABOUT CRI DU CHAT SYNDROME (3) TO PROMOTE ANY FORM OF RESEARCH INTO CRI DU CHAT SYNDROME AND TO DISSEMINATE AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Aston Shaw
Rose Lane Business Centre
51-59 Rose Lane
NORWICH
NR1 1BY
- Phone:
- 01603 616300
- Email:
- office@criduchat.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window