Accounts and annual returns THE WEETABIX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1044949
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 12 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 10 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 01 August 2015 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required