Financial history THE WEETABIX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1044949
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £43 £21 £17 £15 £11
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £6.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A