THE WEETABIX CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1044949
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides donations mainly to schools and charities involved with children and young people usually within the local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Total income: £11
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England
Governance
Registration history:
- 14 March 1995: Standard registration
- 02 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- WEETABIX CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43 | £21 | £17 | £15 | £11 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 19 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 12 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 10 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 01 August 2015 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window