ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kenilworth Round Table raise funds through community activities, most notably the Fireworks Gala and Santa Floats. These funds are then distributed to charitable and good causes in the Kenilworth area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 14 March 1995: Standard registration
- KENILWORTH ROUND TABLE (Working name)
- KENILWORTH ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elliot Gillan | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Edward Sharp | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huw Lansdowne | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Greenwood | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.27k | £6.50k | £5.91k | £122.07k | £128.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.00k | £12.65k | £8.35k | £100.07k | £137.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 December 2023 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES, TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Mill End
KENILWORTH
Warwickshire
CV8 2HP
- Phone:
- 07912661110
- Website:
-
WWW.KENILWORTHROUNDTABLE.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window