INGLEBY BARWICK COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ingleby Barwick Community Hall - Can be hired for various activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 14 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susy Slater | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA RAINES | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Albert Strike | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Elizabeth Fryer | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Kirby | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RAINES | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA WAITES | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer RUTLAND | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.22k | £20.04k | £20.35k | £30.86k | £32.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.52k | £23.44k | £28.27k | £36.74k | £37.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF INGLEBY BARWICK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
INGLEBY BARWICK IN THE COUNTY OF STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ingleby Barwick Community Hall
Haresfield Way
Ingleby Barwick
Stockton on Tees
TS17 0YL
- Phone:
- 07443872328
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window