Trustees INGLEBY BARWICK COMMUNITY HALL

Charity Number: 1044973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susy Slater Trustee 11 October 2024
None on record
SANDRA RAINES Trustee 11 August 2023
None on record
Edward Albert Strike Trustee 11 August 2023
None on record
Michelle Elizabeth Fryer Trustee 20 May 2022
None on record
Jean Kirby Trustee 09 July 2021
None on record
DAVID RAINES Trustee 14 September 2018
None on record
SHEILA WAITES Trustee 05 May 2017
None on record
Jennifer RUTLAND Trustee 08 July 2016
None on record