SHERRIER PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sherrier PTA is a charity run by the parents of children attending the school. Our main aim is to raise money for the pupils of the Sherrier School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 15 March 1995: Standard registration
- S P S G (Working name)
- SHERRIER PARENTS SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Barker | Chair | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Strumpher | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Cross | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wilson | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Wallace | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Watts | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Joanna Woodward | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Connor | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Connor | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Hodson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Woolgar-Williamson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie McDermott | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Beaumont | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Sykes | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Reynolds | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ami Gamble | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Tasker | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Davies | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rewcastle-Adams | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Collett | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chantel McCullough | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Tees | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.56k | £5.03k | £2.82k | £3.06k | £3.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.60k | £3.87k | £3.19k | £1.17k | £5.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 November 2021 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 05/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sherrier C Of E Primary School
Bitteswell Road
LUTTERWORTH
Leicestershire
LE17 4EX
- Phone:
- 01455552791
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window