KIRTLINGTON SCHOOL FRIENDS

Charity number: 1044990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides funds to further the education of children at Kirtlington CE School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £8,308
Total expenditure: £3,673

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hazel Baker Chair 13 September 2018
None on record
Catherine Burgess Trustee 03 October 2023
KIRTLINGTON PFSU
Received: 225 days late
Cher Potter Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Annabel Suarez Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Sonia Marcela Pratt Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Emily Dougall Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Nicola Allison Trustee 07 October 2020
KIRTLINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
HANNAH COLE Trustee 13 September 2018
THINKING OF OSCAR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.81k £2.37k £3.60k £6.30k £8.31k
Total expenditure £11.40k £1.47k £2.31k £4.46k £3.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kirtlington C of E Primary School
Heyford Road
Kirtlington
KIDLINGTON
OX5 3HL
Phone:
07827851764