Financial history THE CHIPPING NORTON SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1045002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.75k £6.63k £6.38k £5.30k £5.40k
Total expenditure £19.45k £522 £0 £600 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A