FUND FOR OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH INTO M E

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, for the benefit of the public, research into the principles & practice of osteopathy in the treatment of Myalgic Encephalomyelitis (M.E.), otherwise known as Chronic Fatigue Syndrome, & to disseminate the useful results of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 1995: Standard registration
- F O R M E (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley McDonald | Chair | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LAURENT HEIB | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLIVIA McDONALD | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BROOKWELL | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Geden | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER GITTINGS | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
TINA RUSHTON | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN TROTTER | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.39k | £1.15k | £1.75k | £5.21k | £15.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.12k | £6.25k | £5.23k | £4.12k | £35.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED ON 26 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, RESEARCH INTO THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF OSTEOPATHY IN THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS/CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME (M.E./CFS) AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Noddle Hill Barn
Gisburn Road
Sawley
CLITHEROE
Lancashire
BB7 4LQ
- Phone:
- 01706825477
- Email:
- formecharity1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window