Financial history MORECAMBE HOMELESS ACTION

Charity number: 1045029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.05k £1.65k £13.54k £8.77k £2.41k
Total expenditure £4.70k £2.40k £3.52k £6.63k £6.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A