NORTH SEACROFT GOOD NEIGHBOURS' SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Socials Trips & Outings Pescriptions & Medical Supplies Benefit Checks & Form Filling Practical Support Bereavement Support Hospital Visiting Luncheon Club Shopping Decorating Gardening Dementia Support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income includes £59,806 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 March 1995: Standard registration
- 07 November 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 07 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1183406 SEACROFT FRIENDS AND NEIGHBOURS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.52k | £63.75k | £62.92k | £69.35k | £87.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.94k | £54.63k | £55.44k | £49.68k | £62.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £42.24k | £34.50k | £45.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £42.25k | £59.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 13 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 13 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 03 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 03 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 08 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 09 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 09 November 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 12 JANUARY 1995 AND 26 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF AGED PERSONS (THOSE OF 60 OR OVER) LIVING IN NORTH SEACROFT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR MAY HEREAFTER BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE,PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF PRACTICAL HELP, OR SUPPORT AND ADVICE CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NORTH SEACROFT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window