Accounts and annual returns SIGGLESTHORNE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 18 August 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 October 2023 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 February 2022 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required