Financial history ARTISTS STUDIO COMPANY

Charity number: 1045067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.14m £2.53m £2.66m £2.57m £2.96m
Total expenditure £2.02m £2.22m £2.09m £2.13m £2.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £170.83k £49.05k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £193.29k £308.13k £49.05k £180.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.14m £2.33m £2.34m £2.50m £2.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £13.92k £17.33k £27.34k £32.26k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.02m £2.22m £2.09m £2.13m £2.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0