JOHN O'GAUNT PARENT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PSA represents the parents & staff of John O'Gaunt School. Its purpose is to raise money for the benefit of its students. This money is then used to purchase items of equipment that enhance the pupils learning & social experience that cannot be provided from public funds. Money raised is distributed by the committee to support requests based on the likely benefit to be derived.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £14,408
Total expenditure: £2,336

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Hopkins Chair Chair 05 October 2022
None on record
Jon Shatford Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
JENNIFER ANNE GREEN Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Deborah Arden-Hunt Secretary Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.27k £7.58k £10.79k £6.70k £14.41k
Total expenditure £13.55k £8.87k £8.77k £2.09k £2.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
John O'Gaunt School
Priory Road
Hungerford
RG17 0AN
Phone:
01488682400