THE FOVANT BADGES SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fovant Badges Society carries out work to maintain and preserve the regimental crests on the Chalke Valley Downs, Wiltshire, thereby furthering the education of the public and promoting "esprit de corps".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Anna Green | Chair | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Wallis | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oliver John Harben Chamberlain QVRM TD DL | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter Harvey | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Richard Lord RN Retd. | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE BRANTINGHAM | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Gorse | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE STUART LISTER | Trustee | 26 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.29k | £29.58k | £31.90k | £34.85k | £50.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.26k | £2.93k | £5.04k | £44.84k | £23.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/08/1994 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/1996 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE ESPRIT DE CORPS AND MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY MAINTAINING AND PRESERVING THE REGIMENTAL CRESTS ON THE CHALK VALLEY DOWNS
Area of benefit
CHALKE VALLEY DOWNS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANAM CARA
DINTON ROAD
FOVANT
SALISBURY
SP3 5JW
- Phone:
- 01722714651
- Email:
- fbs.sec@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window