SGGSJ Telford

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 17 March 1995: Standard registration
- Gurdwara - Siri Guru Gobind Singh Ji (Telford) (Working name)
- GURU NANAK DARBAR GURUDWARA OAKENGATES, TELFORD (Working name)
- PUNJABI CULTURAL SOCIETY, OAKENGATES (Working name)
- Guru Nanak Darbar Gurdwara, Oakengates (Previous name)
- PUNJABI CULTURAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inderjit Singh Gill | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Joginder Singh Bdesha | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Davinder Singh Chhina | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sukhvir Singh Sidhu | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gurvir Singh Sundhers | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.83k | £89.18k | £46.53k | £91.31k | £213.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.01k | £67.06k | £34.42k | £52.63k | £57.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 1994 as amended on 10 Mar 2019 as amended on 10 Mar 2019 as amended on 28 Apr 2019 as amended on 11 Sep 2022 as amended on 18 Jun 2023 as amended on 24 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
A.TO PROMOTE THE SIKH RELIGION THROUGH THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES. B.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TELFORD AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION IN BOTH PUNJABI AND ENGLISH. C.TO PROMOTE FACILITIES IN INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF TELFORD AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT. D.TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN TELFORD AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
TELFORD AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gurdwara Siri Guru Gobind Singh Ji
Whitechapel Way
Priorslee
TELFORD
Shropshire
TF2 9FN
- Phone:
- 01952 915067
- Email:
- info@telfordgurdwara.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window