GOOD ENOUGH MOTHERING LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance for training, leisure pursuits and life skills to single women expecting their first child or with children under the age of 13 years who currently reside in London boroughs. The trustees have currently agreed a small amount of funding to Young Persons floating support in the London boroughs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 March 1995: Standard registration
- 26 March 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 26 March 2025: Funds transferred to 269158 JUST CIRCLE LIMITED
- GEM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £45.48k | £0 | £0 | £77.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF HOMELESS LONE MOTHERS PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION FOR SUCH PERSONS AND (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF LONE MOTHERS ABOUT THE PROPER CARE TREATMENT AND THE UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window