GREAT AND LITTLE LEIGHS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 1045120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants to young people under the age of 25 years living within Great and Little Leighs for further education and training. Also grants to voluntary organisations working with young people in the area, and grants to local catchment area schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,916
Total expenditure: £9,286

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GT AND LITTLE LEIGHS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY (Working name)
  • BRITISH SCHOOL GREAT LEIGHS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Cooke Chair 14 March 2022
None on record
Jane Ann Smith Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
DAVID MARCUS Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Janis Margaret Waters Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
Susan Jean Bunton Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
BRENDA YOUNG Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.08k £9.41k £10.85k £11.32k £11.92k
Total expenditure £13.08k £4.12k £17.68k £6.40k £9.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bridge End
Station Road
Hatfield Peverel
CHELMSFORD
CM3 2DS
Phone:
07746883421
Website:

No information available