THE ST ALOYSIUS COLLEGE PLAYING FIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was set up to acquire the school playing field in Hurst Avenue, Crouch End, London N6, which had been used by the staff and pupils of St. Aloysius' College since 1912 under a Lease agreement. The Charity supports the College by ensuring that the sports facilities at the playing field are maintained to a high standard and enhanced for the benefit of staff, pupils and community users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 22 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN GALLAGHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Akinola Fayoyin | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Grimes | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Kinsella | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SABINI | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEN MAHONEY | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENIS O'SHEA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCIS ALBERT AYERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.49k | £80.79k | £77.96k | £76.11k | £55.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.98k | £73.39k | £68.69k | £47.28k | £60.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 November 2024 | 375 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2023 | 281 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2023 | 536 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 April 2021 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF ST ALOYSIUS COLLEGE BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PLAYING FIELDS FOR THE USE OF SUCH PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 ATHENAEUM ROAD
LONDON
N20 9AL
- Phone:
- 02084458949
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window